Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Lucero, Monica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kyle Scott Law, against Almanza, Rosemary, Almanza, Rudy, James, Phillip, Phillip, James, represented by Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar, Gilsleider Mcmahon & Molinelli, Gilsleider, Mcmahon, Molinelli & Phan, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 07, 2019 |
CategoryPi Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2024Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 13, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: August 07, 2019Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Document Received
Date: February 25, 2021Trial Setting Order filed
Date: February 08, 2024Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 07, 2019Declaration re:
Date: May 13, 2022Stipulation & Order re: Appointment of Judge Pro Tem filed
Date: July 29, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2024Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: August 28, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 14, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2024Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 27, 2019Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: December 10, 2019Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 28, 2023Notice Filed
Date: June 16, 2022Notice Filed
Date: March 29, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: February 20, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 22, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 13, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 26, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 07, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: April 29, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 07, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: March 11, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: August 19, 2020Application for Order for Publication or Posting of
Date: November 18, 2019Answer Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Answer Filed
Date: May 29, 2020Motion in Limine re:
Date: March 28, 2024Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 28, 2020Trial Setting Order filed
Date: March 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 25, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 17, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 10, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: July 30, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: October 21, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: May 23, 2022Motion to Compel Independent Medical Examination (IME)
Date: February 26, 2021Motion re:
Date: May 13, 2022Declaration re:
Date: February 26, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
August 08, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
April 08, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Party appeared by audio and/or video | |
April 04, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document Received *COURTESY COPY* of MIL #7 re: diffusion tensor imaging ("DTI"), proof and order |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: (Def) #1; medical expenses in excess of the amounts paid |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: (Def) #5; preconditioning jurors during Voir Dire with hypothetical or specific dollar figures |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: (Def) #4; the Reptile Theory |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: (Def) #3; the Golden Rule |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.