Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mendoza, Regina, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Schwimer Weinsteinllp, against Does 2 Through 100, Loma Linda University Health, Loma Linda University Medical Center, A California Corporation, Loma Linda University Medical Center - Murrieta, A California Corporation, Loma Linda University Shared Services, A California Corporation, (total of 5) See All represented by Cole Pedroza Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2019 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a first amended complaint filed by Regina Mendoza against Loma Linda University Shared Services, Loma Linda University Medical Center, and Loma Linda University Medical Center Murrieta. Regina Mendoza alleges discrimination based on...
Amended Complaint Filed
Date: November 27, 2019Motion for New Trial
Date: June 13, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Objection Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 10, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: January 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 30, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 19, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 07, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 15, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 24, 2019Objection Filed
Date: July 14, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 02, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 22, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Motion Filed
Date: January 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 23, 2020Answer Filed
Date: July 23, 2020Reply Filed
Date: March 09, 2020Declaration re:
Date: March 02, 2020Reply Filed
Date: March 09, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 16, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Motion Filed
Date: December 26, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 15, 2020Reply Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 10, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 24, 2019Objection Filed
Date: April 17, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 09, 2020Judgment - Summary
Date: June 06, 2023Reply Filed
Date: January 23, 2020Reply Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 06, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: April 10, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 02, 2020Reply Filed
Date: October 30, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 30, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 13, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Reply Filed
Date: July 07, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 27, 2023Reply Filed
Date: January 22, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: July 26, 2019Ex Parte Filed
Date: August 14, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 30, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Motion Filed
Date: October 07, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 10, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Motion Filed
Date: January 08, 2020Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: August 25, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 18, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 31, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: June 23, 2021Notice Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Reply Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Objection Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Motion to Amend Answer
Date: February 03, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 07, 2020Motion to Compel
Date: August 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 03, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 20, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: January 19, 2023Reply Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 17, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 24, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 20, 2021Notice Sent re:
Date: March 25, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 09, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 15, 2023Index of Exhibits
Date: March 03, 2023Notice Imaged
Date: July 26, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: November 02, 2021Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: August 30, 2021Amended Document Filed re:
Date: September 28, 2021Motion Filed
Date: March 13, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: January 24, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 01, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: June 24, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 12, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: September 22, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 23, 2021Amended Document Filed re:
Date: March 03, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 08, 2021Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: April 20, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 14, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 24, 2023Reply Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 13, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: August 23, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 26, 2019Reply Filed
Date: January 20, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: October 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Motion to Dismiss
Date: September 16, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: October 08, 2021Motion re:
Date: February 17, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: June 14, 2023Reply Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Amended Document Filed re:
Date: September 28, 2021Reply Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Document(s) Placed in File
Date: November 05, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Reply Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: August 22, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: September 28, 2021Notice
Date: October 17, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 23, 2021Motion re:
Date: June 23, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: May 21, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 23, 2021Amended Document Filed re:
Date: September 21, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: July 30, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 22, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 18, 2022Reply Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: June 23, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 18, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 21, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Reply Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 16, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 31, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2023-01-12T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 18, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 26, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 26, 2019Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
July 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): [Proposed] Judgment; Duplicate filing. Previously filed 6/6/23 |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed DEF OBJECTIONS TO PLA SUPPLEMENTAL DECL IN SUPPORT OF MTN FOR NEW TRIAL |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed PLA REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NTC OF MTN AND MTN FOR NEW TRIAL FOLLOWING THE FEBRUARY 1, 2023 ORDER GRANTING DEF MSJ AND SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMO PA |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $13 fax fee paid |
|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for New Trial |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed DEF OPPO TO MTN FOR NEW TRIAL |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed DEF NTC OF ERRATA OF DEF OPPO TO PLA MTN FOR NEW TRIAL AND DECL OF DAVID Z. SOHN IN SUPPORT THEREOF |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Opposition |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Filed by defendant Loma Linda University Shared Services et al |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.