Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
C-Point Clf, Inc. A California Corporation, Fang, Cong, Jiang, Xiaolei, Global Leader Logistics, Inc. A California Corporation, Liu, Yanqi, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Inhouse Corporation A Law Firm, against C-Point Clf, Inc A California Corporation, Fang, Cong, Jiang, Xiaolei, represented by Law Offices Of Kevin S Avery, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJune 20, 2019 |
CategoryOther Civil Contracts |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions117 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Order Filed Re:
Date: September 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 20, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 20, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: June 20, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 20, 2019Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: August 19, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 13, 2019Amended Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 05, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 26, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: December 27, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: January 06, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 13, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: March 30, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: July 06, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: October 16, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Notice Sent re:
Date: December 15, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Order signed and Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 04, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 24, 2022Notice Sent re:
Date: May 13, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: July 12, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 12, 2022Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2020-10-16T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Motion to Compel
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Order signed and Filed
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Order signed and Filed
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-12-15T00:00:00Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: 2022-01-11T00:00:00Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: 2022-03-03T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: June 03, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: September 26, 2019Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: January 13, 2020Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-10-06T00:00:00Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: 2021-11-08T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-12-14T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.