Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Rivas, Ernestina, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Frank, Michael F, Law Offices Of Lilian D Hoats, against Torres-Montiel, Yolanda, Torres, Teresa, represented by Hanger Steinberg Shapiro & Ash, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 17, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is an amendment to an existing complaint filed in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, Ernestina Rivas, is represented by attorney Michael F Frank. The defendant in the original complaint was refer...
Exhibits List Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Special Verdict filed.
Date: April 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Notice Imaged
Date: April 14, 2020Declaration in Opposition to Motion (Reply)
Date: April 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Objection Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Motion Filed
Date: September 30, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 11, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: September 30, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Application for Order for Publication or Posting of
Date: July 31, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 02, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: June 17, 2019Trial Brief Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 18, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: November 19, 2019Notice Filed
Date: July 05, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 06, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 02, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 15, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Answer Filed
Date: December 16, 2019Reply Filed
Date: July 01, 2020Motion Filed
Date: January 07, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 30, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 10, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 15, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 04, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 09, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: April 18, 2023Notice
Date: April 18, 2023Answer Filed
Date: December 16, 2019Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 20, 2023Notice Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Motion re:
Date: May 05, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 03, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: December 02, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Reply to Motion re:
Date: August 12, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Objection Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: August 07, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 15, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Order for Publication of Summons in Newspaper Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 02, 2019Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: September 05, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 17, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Trial Setting Order filed
Date: February 09, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 17, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: December 06, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: June 17, 2019Motion Re: Summary Adjudication
Date: June 06, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 13, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 20, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 17, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 17, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: May 24, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 26, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 11, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: September 08, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 13, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
November 02, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
August 17, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Reply to opposition to request for judicial notice at trial |
|
August 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed | |
August 07, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed DEF PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Objection Filed DEF OBJECTION TO PLA RJN IN OPPO TO MIL |
|
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Witness List Filed | |
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Trial Brief Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.