Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alcantar, Alejandro, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Lawyers For Justice Pc, against Does 1 Through 100, Nitto Tire U.S.A. Inc., Toyo Tire Holdings Of Americas Inc. A California Corporation, Toyo Tire U.S.A. Corp., represented by Littler Mendelson Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management367 days |
Filing DateJune 10, 2019 |
CategoryEmployment-Other |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended class action, representative action, and collective action complaint for damages filed by Alejandro Alcantar, individually and on behalf of other members of the general public similarly situated, against TOYO TIRE HO...
Answer Filed
Date: July 25, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 27, 2019Amended Document Filed re:
Date: April 18, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 01, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: June 10, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 08, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 26, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 15, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 05, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 12, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 10, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 10, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 10, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: June 10, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: July 11, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 19, 2021Motion re:
Date: March 19, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 19, 2021Order signed and Filed
Date: April 07, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 16, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: September 07, 2021Order signed and Filed
Date: September 29, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 11, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 25, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.