Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Jimenez, Alejandro, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Aegis Law Firm, against Vector Resources, Inc. A California Corporation, represented by Fisher & Phillips Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Cohn, David presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management321 days |
|
Filing DateMay 28, 2019 |
CategoryEmployment - Complex |
|
Last RefreshedApril 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions72 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 15, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: December 05, 2019Amended Document Filed re:
Date: July 30, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: May 28, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 11, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 24, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 06, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 08, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 26, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 28, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 28, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: July 23, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 28, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: May 31, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: July 18, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 31, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: July 30, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 01, 2019Amended Complaint Filed
Date: July 30, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: August 08, 2019Reply Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Declaration re:
Date: August 31, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: August 12, 2021Answer Filed
Date: September 13, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 30, 2021Declaration re:
Date: August 31, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: June 03, 2021Motion re:
Date: August 31, 2021Declaration re:
Date: August 31, 2021Points and Authorities Filed
Date: September 04, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 04, 2020Motion Filed
Date: September 04, 2020Notice Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 13, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 18, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Order signed and Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 20, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 12, 2021Reply Filed
Date: September 24, 2020Reply Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Points and Authorities Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Motion Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 30, 2020Motion Filed
Date: July 30, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.