Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Cruz, Nicole, Mitchell, David, The Lucas Corporation, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Law Office Of Randal P Hannah, against All Persons Claiming, California Td Specialists, Milligan, Jerilyn, Milligan, Tim, Nolan, Margaret Katherine, (total of 13) See All represented by Fidelity National Law Group, The Ryan Firm, The Ryan Firm Apc, The Singer Law Group, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tony Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTony Raphael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 22, 2019 |
CategoryUnlimited Civil Complaint - Real Property |
Last RefreshedJanuary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: July 18, 2022Declaration re:
Date: June 29, 2022Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: July 05, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: June 07, 2021Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: May 22, 2019Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties
Date: November 16, 2023Motion for Order
Date: June 24, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 19, 2021Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: September 07, 2023Objection Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: July 18, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: February 26, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 12, 2021Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: June 30, 2022Declaration re:
Date: May 10, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 10, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 22, 2019Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: November 23, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: September 19, 2022Answer Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 12, 2020Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: November 21, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Brief Filed
Date: July 08, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 19, 2022Motion Filed Re:
Date: August 16, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Answer Filed
Date: October 21, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 26, 2020Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 29, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 17, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 23, 2023Memo of Costs Filed. Costs in the Amount of
Date: August 16, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: June 05, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 29, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 22, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 19, 2020Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: August 12, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 17, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 18, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 21, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 19, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 12, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 22, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: May 18, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 12, 2020Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: September 25, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 02, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: May 22, 2019Notice of Pendency of Action Filed
Date: June 05, 2019Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed
Date: October 11, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Notice Filed
Date: March 28, 2022Notice Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: November 17, 2022Order signed and filed.
Date: August 01, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 16, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 23, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 13, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: June 28, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: September 19, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 23, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 26, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 24, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 31, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: July 14, 2021Ex Parte Application
Date: May 18, 2023Reply Filed
Date: June 05, 2023Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: August 15, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: June 07, 2023Objection Filed
Date: June 09, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 13, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: May 19, 2023Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: August 29, 2023Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: August 15, 2023Notice of Appeal on Order or Motion Filed - Court of Appeal
Date: August 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Record on Appeal Certified to Reviewing Court & Parties | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Reporters Transcripts on Appeal Received | |
October 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript On Appeal Filed | |
October 02, 2023 |
Department S29 - SBJC
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO DETERMINE PARTY PREVAILING AND FIX AMOUNT OF ATTORNEYS FEES AWARDABLE AS ITEM OF COSTS |
|
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document Received File submit- Opposition- Priority |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.