Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lynn, Teah, filed a(n) Product Liability-Complex case represented by Lattie Malanga Libertino Llp, against Rite Aid Corporation A Delaware Corporation, represented by Pepper Hamilton Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management347 days |
Filing DateMay 03, 2019 |
CategoryProduct Liability-Complex |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion Filed
Date: August 22, 2019Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: September 11, 2019Stipulation Filed re:
Date: February 19, 2020Stipulation Filed re:
Date: July 10, 2020Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: May 10, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 09, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 22, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 19, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: May 31, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: May 03, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 03, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 03, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 03, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 03, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 31, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 01, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: June 18, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: July 10, 2020Motion re:
Date: December 03, 2020Notice
Date: July 13, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: December 14, 2020Declaration re:
Date: December 03, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: December 28, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 19, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 23, 2021Amended Judgment Filed
Date: December 23, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 24, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.