Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ally Bank A Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Vanlochem & Associates Llp, against Lira, John B, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2019 |
CategoryCollections |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Notice Imaged
Date: April 19, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 19, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 19, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 19, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 26, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 08, 2019Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: May 10, 2019Notice of NSF Check Mailed to
Date: May 13, 2029Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2029 | Docket Event |
Notice of NSF Check Mailed to NSF CHECK ($30.00) FROM ALL N ONE LEGAL SUPPORT INC. NOTICE SENT 05/13/19. DUE 05/17/19. |
|
October 21, 2019 | |||
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
August 13, 2019 | |||
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION BY PLA |
|
August 12, 2019 | |||
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLAINTIFF ALLY BANK |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event | PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR NTC OF MTN HRG/NSF PAID BY ALLY BANK IN THE AMOUNT OF $70.00. 190516-0463-VS MMF/ 30.00 FCB/ 40.00 PAYMT | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Fee Voided ** VOID ** MOTION NOTICED HEARING FEE SB1021 RECEIPT# 190426-0232 VOIDED BY SKEEN FROM VGONZ NSF CK |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.