Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Flexi-Van Leasing, Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Office Of Steven A. Booska, against Mcclanahan, Alex, Mcclanahan, Alexandria, Total Trucking Service, Inc., represented by Mayr Lee Apc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Kory Mathewson presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 20, 2019 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions127 days |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by GITI TIRE USA LTD against TOTAL TRUCKING SERVICE INC and JOES 1-10 (inclusive). GITI TIRE USA LTD is a corporation organized under the laws of the State of Delaware and qualified to do business in Californ...
Reply Filed
Date: August 31, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: March 20, 2019Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 01, 2020Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: October 08, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 24, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 20, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 24, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: October 01, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 25, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 20, 2019Answer Filed
Date: January 07, 2021Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: February 03, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: February 26, 2020Declaration re:
Date: July 22, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 25, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 20, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 20, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Motion Filed
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 02, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 05, 2019Answer Filed
Date: August 25, 2020Declaration re:
Date: September 19, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: April 29, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 08, 2020Answer Filed
Date: August 10, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 28, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 15, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: September 03, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 28, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: May 05, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: July 20, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 06, 2020Summons Issued on
Date: February 28, 2020Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Supplemental Complaint Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: September 19, 2019Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 03, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 21, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: February 28, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 22, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: July 22, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 22, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 04, 2020Points and Authorities Filed
Date: July 22, 2020Answer Filed
Date: February 03, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 19, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: July 14, 2020Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: October 14, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 17, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 06, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 26, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 28, 2020Summons Issued on
Date: February 28, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 16, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: October 20, 2020Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 04, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 02, 2020Notice Filed
Date: January 25, 2021Copy of Undertaking Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Notice Filed
Date: January 13, 2023Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: December 15, 2020Notice of Bankruptcy Filed (Individual Party)
Date: November 16, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: May 16, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: March 19, 2024Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 27, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: December 01, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 09, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 26, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 02, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: January 11, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 11, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 18, 2022Answer Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Comment: (Imaged)
Date: September 02, 2020Conversion event
Date: July 14, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 21, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: September 03, 2020Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 22, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: November 05, 2019Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: June 29, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 08, 2020Comment: (Imaged)
Date: July 14, 2020Comment: (Imaged)
Date: July 21, 2020Declaration re:
Date: September 19, 2019Comment: (Imaged)
Date: September 02, 2020Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: September 19, 2019Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 17, 2020Summons Issued on
Date: February 03, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 05, 2019Answer Filed
Date: October 20, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: July 14, 2020Reply Filed
Date: August 31, 2020Request to Enter Default Returned for the Following Reasons:
Date: September 19, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 13, 2020Answer Filed
Date: August 10, 2020Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: July 25, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 13, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 13, 2020Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: October 08, 2019Copy of Undertaking
Date: 2021-05-13T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 |
Department R12 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Mathewson, Kory |
||
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
December 13, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration Re Status |
|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
June 16, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Complaint without prejudice filed by plaintiff Flexi Van Leasing |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service Return to Sender Not Deliverable as Addressed Unable to Forward |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.