Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
M.D.L.F., filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Salazar, Theida, against Arrowood, Cindy, Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Fisher, Diana, Morongo Unified School District, A Government Entity, represented by Martin & Martin Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 18, 2019 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a fourth amended complaint filed by Melinda Fields on behalf of her minor son, M.D.L.F. The defendants named in the complaint are Cindy Arrowood, Diana Fisher, and Does 1 through 10. The complaint alleges several violations, includi...
Order Filed Re:
Date: February 07, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 15, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 04, 2019Motion Filed
Date: October 28, 2020At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: December 13, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 03, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 18, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 28, 2020Declaration re:
Date: June 15, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: October 28, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 03, 2019Motion Filed
Date: June 11, 2020Reply Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 17, 2020Reply Filed
Date: August 26, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: June 11, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: June 11, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 15, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 23, 2020Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 26, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: January 24, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 29, 2019Stipulation Filed re:
Date: January 24, 2020Notice Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: February 19, 2020Demurrer Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 18, 2019Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 22, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 23, 2020Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 17, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 03, 2023Notice Imaged
Date: May 19, 2020Answer Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 22, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 11, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 10, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: June 22, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: November 17, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 04, 2021Tentative decisions
Date: September 29, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Motion re:
Date: July 27, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: July 27, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 23, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Declaration re:
Date: September 22, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: March 18, 2019Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 12, 2020Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 29, 2019Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: August 22, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 10, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 24, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 23, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver Granted Filed
Date: March 18, 2019Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: January 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Notice
Date: September 22, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 18, 2019Motion re:
Date: July 27, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 22, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 08, 2021Declaration re:
Date: November 17, 2021Petition & Order for Appt of Guardian Ad Litem Granted
Date: March 22, 2019Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: July 27, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: November 17, 2021Notice
Date: September 22, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 03, 2020Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 29, 2019Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 25, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
August 22, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed With Prejudice |
|
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Return to Court's Control | |
June 26, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
June 22, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
June 05, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
June 01, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Petition for Approval of Compromise of Claim or Action or Disposition of proceeds of judgment for minor or person with a disability; Duplicate Previously filed 05/19/2023; Case Number for reference CIVDS1908236-MC |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $32.00 cc paid 05/23/2023 for fax fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.