Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Stanley Tulchin Associates - Western Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Knutson Law Group, against Esposito, Antonio, Esposito, Regina, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael A. Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2019 |
CategoryApplication For Renewal Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed
Date: February 25, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: February 25, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 25, 2019Comment: (Imaged)
Date: February 25, 2019Renewal of Judgment Filed
Date: February 25, 2019Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed
Date: March 29, 2019Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: May 06, 2019ORAP Returned Served
Date: August 16, 2019Comment: (Imaged)
Date: October 08, 2019Bench Warrant Recalled
Date: October 08, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino
Date: June 25, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 25, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $639.00. |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Paid WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID 191227-0029-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 191227-0029-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 14805 |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 40280.16 ) |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $639.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,491.90) |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed PROOF OF UNSUCCESSFUL SERVICE OF CIVIL BENCH WARRANT AS TO ANTONIO ESPOSITO FILED. |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comment: (Imaged) COPY OF CIVIL WARRANT RECALL (IMAGED) |
|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | BENCH WARRANT RECALLED | |
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comment: ORIGINAL CIVIL BENCH WARRANT RECALL SENT TO SHERIFF'S CENTRAL CIVIL OFFICE VIA IOM |
|
September 04, 2019 |
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ROBERT MORRIS FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL W. KNUTSON LAW GROUP. PARTIES NOT PRESENT: REGINA ESPOSITO - PROCEEDINGS: ACTION CAME ON FOR EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR. JUDGMENT DEBTOR FAILS TO APPEAR FOR DEBTOR'S EXAM;BENCH WARRANT IS ORDERED ISSUED FOR REGINA ESPOSITO IN THE AMOUNT OF $37,124.00 -- BAIL MAY BE FORFEITED. BENCH WARRANT TO BE ISSUED UPON RECEIPT OF SIGNED AFFIDAVIT AND PROCESSING FEE MADE PAYABLE TO THE APPROPRIATE SERVING AGENCY. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.