Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Murray, Abraham, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Law Office Of Sandra H Castro, Inc, Law Offices Of Kristen Brown, against Simplified Labor Staffing Solutions, Inc., Simplified Staffing Labor Solutions,Llc, Simplified Staffing Labor Solutions-Ontario, represented by Angel City Law, Quintilone & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2019 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 02, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 02, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: November 03, 2022Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: November 03, 2022Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: March 30, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: November 14, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 25, 2023Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: July 25, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: November 14, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Motion re:
Date: September 06, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 31, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 31, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 11, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 04, 2020Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: January 15, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 09, 2019Objection Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 04, 2020Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: September 09, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 04, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 09, 2019Objection Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: August 30, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Answer Filed
Date: September 25, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 26, 2019Answer Filed
Date: February 18, 2020Notice of Hearing Filed
Date: January 15, 2020Proof of Service Filed. Type of Service is:
Date: September 09, 2019Stipulation Filed re:
Date: May 26, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: June 02, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: January 12, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: January 20, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 18, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 13, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 26, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 03, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 09, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 17, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 14, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Kristen B Brown Esq regarding delayed filing of Dismissal filed by plaintiff Abraham Murray |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed with prejudice filed by plaintiff Abraham Murray |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Return to Court's Control | |
July 14, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of Minute Order dated 7/14/2023 |
|
April 17, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
April 13, 2023 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) filed by Plaintiff on Complaint filed 3/6/2019 |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.