Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ramirez, Joe, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Solouki & Savoy, Llp, against Apex Logistics, Llca California Limited Liability Company, Class 8 Truck Repair, Llc A California Limited Liability Company, Hartwick And Hand Llc A Nevada Limited Liability Company, Hartwick & Hand, Inc A California Corporation, Ramirez, Joe, (total of 5) See All represented by Ogletree,Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management357 days |
Filing DateMarch 01, 2019 |
CategoryEmployment-Other-Complex |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 11, 2019Objection Filed
Date: July 17, 2019Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal
Date: August 26, 2019Clerk's Notification of Filing Of Notice of Appeal Filed
Date: August 27, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 05, 2019Reply Filed
Date: July 17, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: November 16, 2022Amended Judgment Filed
Date: November 29, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Notice to Court Reporter(s) to Prepare Appeal Transcript
Date: January 23, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Points and Authorities Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 02, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 03, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: March 01, 2019Amended Document Filed re:
Date: November 08, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 03, 2019Amended Answer/Response Filed
Date: April 12, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: March 05, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 01, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 01, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 01, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: July 01, 2019Motion Filed
Date: July 02, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: August 05, 2019Notice of Appeal filed
Date: August 26, 2019Notice of Election to Proceed Pursuant to CRC 8.124 Filed
Date: August 27, 2019Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: September 06, 2019Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: September 10, 2019Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: September 23, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: October 09, 2019Notice Vacating Notice Of Default Filed
Date: October 09, 2019Document(s) Placed in File
Date: October 29, 2019Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: November 19, 2019Notice To Reporter For Estimate Of Costs Filed and Mailed
Date: December 05, 2019Ntc of Cost for Clerk/Reporter Trans on Appeal Filed/Mailed
Date: December 19, 2019Notice of Default on Appeal Filed
Date: January 06, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 13, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: November 10, 2020Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 12, 2021Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: March 15, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 15, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 15, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 15, 2021Order signed and Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Motion re:
Date: July 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 30, 2021Tentative decisions
Date: October 27, 2021Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 09, 2021Order signed and Filed
Date: November 16, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.