Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case against Montes, Daniel Jacob, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Janet M. Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJanet M. Frangie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2019 |
CategorySummary Judgment (Bail Bonds) |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Petition for Summary Judgment on Bail Bond Forfeiture Filed
Date: January 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 08, 2019Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 08, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: April 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2019 | |||
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: OSC RE:RECEIPT OF ORDER |
|
April 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER VACATING MSJ ON BOND/BOND EXONERATED FILED VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/24/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29. |
|
March 27, 2019 |
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: TO VACATE SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST LEXINGTON NATIONALINSURANCE CORPORATION JANET M FRANGIE,JUDGE CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN;12453 COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN - APPEARANCES: PARTIES NOT PRESENT: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA PARTIES NOT PRESENT: DANIEL JACOB MONTES SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN PAUL SERRAO FOR RESPONDENT IN INTEREST LEXINGTON NATIONAL INS.. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - MOTION LEXINGTON NATIONALINSURANCE CORPORATION'S MOTION VACATE SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS HEARD. NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED. - COURT FINDS: LEXINGTON NATIONALINSURANCE CORPORATION'S MOTION TO VACATE SUMMARY JUDGMENT IS GRANTED. THE SUMMARY JUDGMENT ENTERED ON JANUARY 8, 2019, IN CASE NO. FVI17003157 IS VACATED AND BOND NUMBER 2017-EE-007088 IS REINSTATED AND EXONERATED. PETITIONER IS DIRECTED TO GIVE NOTICE AND PREPARE AND SERVE AN ORDER AND FILE A CONFORMED COPY IN CASE NO. FVI17003157. - HEARINGS: HEARING RE:OSC RE:RECEIPT OF ORDER SET FOR 04/24/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29. COUNSEL FOR MOVING PARTY TO GIVE NOTICE. === MINUTE ORDER END === ACTION - COMPLETE |
|
February 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION RE: MOTION TO VACATE SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND FOR EXONERATION FILED. |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY LEXINGTON NATIONALINSURANCE CORPORATION FOR MOTION 190205-0655-CK MMF/ 60.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 190205-0655-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 3667184 | |
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Party Added ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA, LEXINGTON NATIONALINSURANCE CORPORATION IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTY IN INTEREST. |
|
February 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Filed MOTION RE: TO VACATE SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR HEARING ON 03/27/19, FILED BY REAL PARTY IN INTEREST LEXINGTON NATIONALINSURANCE CORPORATION (IMAGED) |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petition for Summary Judgment on Bail Bond Forfeiture Filed PETITION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON BAIL BOND FORFEITURE (EXPARTE) AND ORDER FILED. (PC 1306) JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/19 JUDGMENT FOR: PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA JUDGMENT AGAINST: DANIEL JACOB MONTES JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $100,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $435.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $100435.00 COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF SUMMARY JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.