Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Suttell & Hammer, Apc, against Morgan, Michelle K, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Barry L. Plotkin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time182 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 20, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: June 20, 2019Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 20, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 20, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: December 20, 2018Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: January 22, 2019Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: June 17, 2019Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: February 27, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2019 | |||
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 BARRY L PLOTKIN,JUDGE CLERK: SANDRA ORTEGA COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT P HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR SUTTELL & HAMMER, APC. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 09:28 COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: PER REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. 09:28 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
June 20, 2019 |
Judge: Plotkin, Barry L |
||
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MICHELLE K MORGAN WITH COSTS OF $69.50 |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MICHELLE K MORGAN WITH COSTS OF $69.50 |
|
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO MICHELLE K MORGAN WITH COSTS OF $69.50 |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DISCOVER BANK FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES 181221-0168-CK CLS/ 240.00 PAYMT 181221-0168-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 123638 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.