Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Harris, Ozelia, Harris, Stephen, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Harris Apc, against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., represented by Anglin, Flewelling, Rasmussen, Campbell &Trytten, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donna G. Garza presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
CategoryBusiness Tort/Unfair Business Practice Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time139 days |
Reply Filed
Date: May 06, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 02, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 15, 2019Motion Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 25, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 15, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 15, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: April 15, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 12, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 12, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 27, 2019Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 20, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 26, 2019Amended Complaint Filed
Date: March 11, 2019Motion Filed
Date: March 13, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 16, 2019Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: February 20, 2019Ex-Parte Motion Filed re:
Date: April 12, 2019Reply Filed
Date: April 03, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 29, 2019Motion Filed
Date: March 06, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: March 27, 2019Ex-Parte Motion Filed re:
Date: March 08, 2019Demurrer Filed
Date: February 19, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: December 20, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: December 20, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 20, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 20, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 20, 2018Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: March 06, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 06, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 29, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 29, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 29, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 12, 2019Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: May 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE | |
June 20, 2019 | Hearing | Trial Setting Conference Original Type Trial Setting Conference Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE | |
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
June 20, 2019 | |||
May 13, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
May 13, 2019 | Hearing | Motion Re: Original Type Motion Re: Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: DEMURRER TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. |
|
May 13, 2019 | |||
May 08, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Garza, Donna Gunnell Comment MOTION RE: FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY PLAINTIFF STEPHEN HARRIS, OZELIA HARRIS DONNA GUNNELL GARZA,JUDGE CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON;7079 COURT ATTENDANT C LOCKMAN - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY MONIQUE HARRIS APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR STEPHEN HARRIS, OZELIA HARRIS. ATTORNEY LYNETTE WINSTON PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD - MOTION STEPHEN HARRIS, OZELIA HARRIS'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS HEARD. THE COURT'S TENTATIVE RULING TO DENY MOTION IS RECITED INTO THE RECORD. ARGUED BY COUNSEL AND SUBMITTED. - COURT FINDS: STEPHEN HARRIS, OZELIA HARRIS'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT IS DENIED. MOTION DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. PLAINTIFFS HAVE NOT COMPLIED WITH CRC 3.1324. - HEARINGS: HEARING DATE OF 05/13/19 CONFIRMED. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
May 08, 2019 | Hearing | Request for Dismissal Filed View Document REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ST Comment REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.