Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Bowling, Rhonda, Brown, Sharna, Inlow, Angel, Niedzienski, Angelic, O'Keefe, Jill, (total of 9) See All filed a(n) Product Liability-Complex case represented by Common Sense Counsel Llp, against Bayer Corp. An Indiana Corporation, Bayer Essure Inc. A Delaware Corporation, Bayer Healthcare Llc A Delaware Company, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. A Delaware Corporation, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2018 |
CategoryProduct Liability-Complex |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 20, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: March 04, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: March 06, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING RE: STATUS OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS DAVID COHN,JUDGE CLERK: ERIN MUELLER COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA;12612 COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: ROBERT KLEINMAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR SHARNA BROWN. WAQAS AKMAL APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BAYER CORP.. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD ACTION CAME ON FOR HEARING RE: STATUS OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS. OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: SUBJECT TO COORDINATION PROCEEDINGS THE COURT SETS NO FUTURE HEARING DATES UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COORDINATION MOTION JUDGE. NOTICE WAIVED. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF ORDER ADDITION OF CASES TO JCCP & STAY FILED BY SHARNA BROWN. |
|
March 08, 2019 | |||
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COMPLEX CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Court Orders Matter Stayed MATTER STAYED |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): STIP & ORDER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEFENDANTS HAVE NOT PAID 1ST APP FEES. ATTORNEY IS AWARE OF RETURN REASON. CASE IS STA. |
|
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Comment: RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent re: NOTICE OF HEARING REGARDING STATUS OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS SENT. PLEASE BE ADVISED A HEARING RE: STATUS OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS HAS BEEN SET FOR 09/04/19 AT 8:30AM IN DPARTMENT S26. ALL OTHER HEARINGS HAVE BEEN VACATED AND CASE IS CURRENTLY STAYED. |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS FILED BY SHARNA BROWN. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.