Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Midland Funding, Llc, against Donahoe, Dawn, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Gilbert G. Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2018 |
CategoryCollections-Dec. Reduced Filing Fee Bp6322.1(C)(1) |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time455 days |
Notice Imaged
Date: December 05, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 05, 2018Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: December 21, 2018Certificate of Electronic Recording Imaged
Date: December 04, 2019Certificate of Electronic Recording Imaged
Date: March 04, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2020 |
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING IMAGED | |
March 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/DEFAULT JUDGMENT GILBERT OCHOA,JUDGE CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:50 COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. REASON: NO APPEARANCES. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 03/04/20 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE 08:51 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
December 04, 2019 |
Judge: Poncin, Lynn |
||
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING IMAGED | |
December 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK: ILAYALI WADE COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT C. BELLAMY - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:46 - HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. COUNSEL REPRESENTS THE DEFENDANT HAS DEFAULTED ON PAYMENTS AND INTENDS ON SUBMITTING A DEFAULT JUDGMENT TO THE COURT. - BASED ON COUNSEL'S REPRESENTATION, THE COURT DECLINES TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS AT THIS TIME; HOWEVER, IF THE DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS NOT SUBMITTED TO THE COURT PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING DATE, THE COURT RESERVES JURISDICTION TO IMPOSE ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 AGAINST PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH CRC 3.740(F). - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/DEFAULT JUDGMENT SET FOR 03/04/20 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16. COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE. CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. 08:47 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
June 05, 2019 | |||
June 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 06/05/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16. |
|
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO DAWN DONAHOE SERVED ON 01/05/19 WITH FEES OF $65.00. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.