Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jacob Joseph& Associates, Llc, filed a(n) General Family - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael A. Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2018 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Petition |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time43 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: December 05, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 05, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 19, 2018Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 08, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 04, 2019 | |||
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes STATUS HEARING ON PETITION |
|
January 17, 2019 |
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER APPROVING TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT PAYMENT RIGHTS FILED |
|
January 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes MOTION RE: FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEMENT (121918) FILED BY PLAINTIFF JACOB JOSEPH& ASSOCIATES, LLC MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS;9826 COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY ROBERT A. GRANTHAM PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER. TIMOTHY BECKHAM PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD COURT INFORMS COUNSEL THAT PAYEE'S NAME CAN NOT BE CONFIDENTIAL. COURT INQUIRES OF THE PAYEE'S FULL NAME. PAYEE STATES FULL NAME AS TIMOTHY BECKHAM. - MOTION JACOB JOSEPH& ASSOCIATES, LLC'S MOTION RE:FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEME IS HEARD. COURT INQUIRES FURTHER OF TIMOTHY BECKHAM. - COURT FINDS: JACOB JOSEPH& ASSOCIATES, LLC'S MOTION RE: FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED SETTLEM IS GRANTED. MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) OF JACOB JOSEPH& ASSOCIATES, LLC IS GRANTED STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Filed NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS HOFFMAN & GRANTHAMLLP FOR COUNSEL REPRESENTING JACOB JOSEPH& ASSOCIATES, LLC FILED |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed SUPPLEMENT TO NOTICE OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF SETTLMENT RIGHTS FILED. |
|
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUPPLEMENT TO PETITION/NTC OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS BY USPS ON 01/08/19 AS TO INTERESTED PARTIES, FILED. |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF HERING ON PETITION BY MAIL ON 12/19/18 AS TO SEE ATTACHED LIST, FILED. |
|
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF TRANSFER OF STRUCTURED FILED BY JACOB JOSEPH& ASSOCIATES, LLC. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.