Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Kovalchuk, Tatiana, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Westside Personal Injury Law Center, against Starbucks Corporation, represented by Higgs Fletcher & Mack, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Thomas S. Garza presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time378 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 23, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 21, 2019Motion Filed
Date: November 22, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: December 05, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 05, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 21, 2019Motion Filed
Date: October 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 21, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 08, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 06, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 12, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 12, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 03, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: December 03, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 24, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: December 24, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2020 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. | |
October 19, 2020 | Hearing | Jury Trial Original Type Jury Trial Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. | |
October 19, 2020 | |||
October 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. |
|
October 15, 2020 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment READINESS CALENDAR | |
October 15, 2020 | Hearing | Readiness Calendar Original Type Readiness Calendar Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment READINESS CALENDAR | |
October 15, 2020 | |||
October 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes READINESS CALENDAR |
|
December 24, 2019 | Hearing | Service type not specified Served Anticipated Server Anticipated Method Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RULING BY MAIL ON 12/23/19 AS TO WESTSIDE PERSONAL INJURY LAW CENTER, FILED. | |
December 24, 2019 | Hearing | Proof of Service Filed View Document PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RULING BY MAIL ON 12 Comment PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF RULING BY MAIL ON 12/23/19 AS TO WESTSIDE PERSONAL INJURY LAW CENTER, FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.