Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bailey, Gerald Lei, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Barry L. Plotkin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBarry L. Plotkin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 28, 2018 |
CategoryPetition Re Change Of Name |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeName Change |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time173 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 28, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 28, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 28, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: January 15, 2019Petition Filed (Civil)
Date: November 28, 2018Amended Document Filed re:
Date: January 15, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: March 19, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: January 15, 2019Amended Document Filed re:
Date: March 25, 2019Proof of Publication re:
Date: May 17, 2019Decree Changing Name filed.
Date: May 20, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: May 20, 2019Notice of NSF Check Mailed to
Date: January 07, 2029Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2029 | Docket Event |
Notice of NSF Check Mailed to NSF CHECK ($250.00) FROM GERALD BAILEY. NOTICE SENT 01/07/19. DUE 01/27/19. |
|
January 07, 2029 | Hearing | Notice of NSF Check Mailed to Comment NSF CHECK ($250.00) FROM GERALD BAILEY. NOTICE SENT 01/07/19. DUE 01/27/19. | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Decree Changing Name filed. DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM GERALD LEI BAILEY TO SLIM GERALDLEI GOODY FILED. |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: NAME CHANGE BARRY L PLOTKIN,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT P HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: PLAINTIFF GERALD LEI BAILEY PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 09:07 PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED IN COURT. COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE. WITNESS -- GERALD LEI BAILEY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION SUFFICIENT AND TRUE. NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED. PETITION RE CHANGE OF NAME OF GERALD LEI BAILEY IS GRANTED DECREE CHANGING NAME IS SIGNED BY THE COURT. HENCEFORTH THE APPLICANT'S NAME SHALL BE SLIM GERALDLEI GOODY. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED ACTION - COMPLETE 09:10 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
May 20, 2019 | Hearing | Decree Changing Name filed. View Document DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM GERALD LEI BAILEY TO SLI Comment DECREE CHANGING NAME FROM GERALD LEI BAILEY TO SLIM GERALDLEI GOODY FILED. | |
May 20, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes View Document OSC RE- NAME CHANGE BARRY L PLOTKIN,JUDGE CLERK- J Judicial Officer Plotkin, Barry L Comment OSC RE: NAME CHANGE BARRY L PLOTKIN,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT P HERNANDEZ - APPEARANCES: PLAINTIFF GERALD LEI BAILEY PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 09:07 PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED IN COURT. COURT FINDS THERE IS APPROPRIATE SERVICE. WITNESS -- GERALD LEI BAILEY IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. COURT FINDS ALLEGATIONS IN PETITION SUFFICIENT AND TRUE. NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED. PETITION RE CHANGE OF NAME OF GERALD LEI BAILEY IS GRANTED DECREE CHANGING NAME IS SIGNED BY THE COURT. HENCEFORTH THE APPLICANT'S NAME SHALL BE SLIM GERALDLEI GOODY. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED DISPOSITION: PETITION GRANTED ACTION - COMPLETE 09:10 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
May 20, 2019 | Hearing | OSC Re: Name Change Original Type OSC Re: Name Change Judicial Officer Plotkin, Barry L Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment OSC RE: NAME CHANGE | |
May 20, 2019 |
Judge: Plotkin, Barry L |
||
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NAME CHANGE FILED. | |
May 17, 2019 | Hearing | Service by Publication Served Anticipated Server Anticipated Method Comment PROOF OF PUBLICATION RE: NAME CHANGE FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.