Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Looney, Gary E., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pro Se, against Aroutiounian, Samuel, Saia Restaurant Group, Llc A California Limited Liability Company, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David A. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid A. Williams Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time76 days |
Legacy Minutes
Date: June 06, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 05, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: June 06, 2019Motion Filed
Date: April 29, 2019Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: February 14, 2019Complaint Filed
Date: November 30, 2018Declaration re:
Date: February 04, 2019Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: June 04, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: February 04, 2019Rqst for Entry of Dflt and Rqst for Clerk's/Court Jmt Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 30, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: November 30, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 26, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 04, 2019Application for Order for Examination Filed
Date: April 04, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: June 05, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: June 06, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 25, 2019Motion to Vacate
Date: February 14, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied
Date: October 12, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 27, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: October 10, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.