Case Last Refreshed: 6 hours ago
Padron, Lourdes, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Havens Malczynski Grigolla, Llp, Hayes, Bradley G., The Hayes Law Firm, Apc, against Nguyen, Aaron, Nguyen, Thuc, represented by Kinkle Rodiger & Spriggs, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 05, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: November 30, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 03, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: June 18, 2019Motion to Compel
Date: April 01, 2021Motion to Compel
Date: April 01, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 26, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: May 13, 2022Motion to Compel Responses
Date: May 13, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 03, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 05, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: June 06, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 20, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 03, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 31, 2018Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: January 26, 2023Answer Filed
Date: December 31, 2018Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 12, 2019Motion re:
Date: July 19, 2021Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: September 19, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 05, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 05, 2018Motion Filed
Date: March 14, 2019Declaration re:
Date: March 14, 2019Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 19, 2019Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 16, 2019Stipulation Filed re:
Date: December 10, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 07, 2022Notice Imaged
Date: November 05, 2018Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: November 05, 2018Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 26, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: April 22, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: May 01, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: May 26, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: June 06, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 05, 2018Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: November 30, 2018Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 14, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 20, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.