Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Yozd, Masses, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 23, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 23, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 23, 2018Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: January 11, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: April 22, 2019Notice Imaged
Date: October 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2019 | |||
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
April 22, 2019 | |||
April 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File NOTICE OF CHAPTER 7 BANKRUPTCY CASE PLACED IN FILE |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of: PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO MASSES YOZD SERVED ON 12/04/18 WITH FEES OF $67.50. |
|
December 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/22/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16. |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.