Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Northern California Collection Service, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Cribb, Steven Douglas, against Alejandro Gonzalez And Jennifer Gonzalez As Individuals And Co-Partners, Gonzalez, Alejandro, Gonzalez, Jennifer, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 17, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections$10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 14, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 17, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 17, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: September 17, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 17, 2018Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: December 14, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 14, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: December 14, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: January 14, 2019Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied
Date: November 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Acknowlgmt of Satisfaction of Jmnt Filed - Fully Satisfied | |
September 17, 2019 | |||
September 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/17/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
March 18, 2019 | |||
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 11906.12 ) |
|
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTIONSERVICE, INC FOR ABSTRACT FEE 190220-0703-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190220-0703-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 23485 | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY NORTHERN CALIFORNIA COLLECTIONSERVICE, INC FOR WRIT FEE 190220-0741-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190220-0741-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 23483 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.