Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Baklanova, Natalia, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Nehme Law Firm, against Mountain View Park Homeowners Association , Inc, A California Non-Profit Mutual Benef, represented by Murchison & Cumming, Pyka Lenhardt Schnaider Dawkins, Pyka Lenhardt Schnaider Dawkins Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Filed
Date: September 13, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 07, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 05, 2019Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: June 13, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: March 06, 2019Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: February 01, 2019Answer Filed
Date: October 26, 2018Stipulation & Order filed
Date: December 05, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: February 06, 2020Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 13, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 04, 2019Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 23, 2018Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: September 05, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 23, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 23, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 23, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 23, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: May 17, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: January 28, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 06, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: May 20, 2020Stipulation & Order filed
Date: February 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-06-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Response to Opposition (Reply)
Date: December 06, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 03, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Reply Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: December 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 10, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
August 10, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
June 20, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $3.00 VS paid on 06.14.23 for Fax Fees |
|
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Notice of Settlement of Entire Case |
|
April 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received notice of change of mailing |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Received from Postal Service IMPORTANT CORRESPONDENCE; NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING;RECEIPT |
|
February 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: copy of Notice of Rescheduled Hearing, receipt for payment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.