Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
American De Rosa Lamparts, Llc, San Remo Hesperia Ii Limited Partnership, Westinghouse Lighting Lp, Jenkins, Eric, Jenkins, Latoya, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Brownstone Law Group P.C, against American De Rosa Lamparts, Llc, Luminance Corporation, San Remo Hesperia Ii Limited Partnership, Sprint Electric, Inc., Westinghouse Lighting Corporation, (total of 6) See All represented by Kuluva Armijo & Garcia, Law Office Of Tracey Lazarus, Lazarus, Tracey, Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, Trachtman & Trachtman Llp, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Non-Motor Vehicle Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 18, 2024Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: November 06, 2018Answer Filed
Date: April 10, 2019Notice Filed
Date: March 22, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Ex Parte Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Notice Imaged
Date: August 01, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 18, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: February 01, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 16, 2019Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: November 06, 2018Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 20, 2024Declaration re:
Date: April 28, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: March 21, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: December 23, 2019Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 05, 2024Answer Filed
Date: April 16, 2019Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 25, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 26, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 21, 2021Notice of Bankruptcy Filed (Individual Party)
Date: September 12, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: February 07, 2020Response Filed to:
Date: March 13, 2023Answer Filed
Date: January 04, 2019Answer Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Complaint and Party Information Entered
Date: August 01, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: May 22, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 11, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: March 22, 2021Declaration re:
Date: April 28, 2022Brief Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 24, 2022Declaration re:
Date: February 10, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 06, 2022Reply Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: March 17, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: July 23, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Notice Filed
Date: April 10, 2024Answer Filed
Date: March 21, 2019Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 30, 2019Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 02, 2023Answer Filed
Date: February 14, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Answer Filed
Date: March 08, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 05, 2019Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 03, 2018Amendment to Complaint Naming Roe Filed
Date: January 09, 2019Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Declaration re:
Date: April 28, 2022Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: September 27, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: July 30, 2020Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 05, 2018Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: August 04, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: April 10, 2019Declaration re:
Date: October 12, 2022Motion Filed Re:
Date: January 10, 2022Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 18, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 01, 2018Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 15, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: May 27, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: November 30, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 23, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: March 08, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 01, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: January 04, 2019Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 04, 2024Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 21, 2022Reply Filed
Date: May 02, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: March 17, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 31, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: July 23, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 12, 2020Motion for Determination of Good Faith Settlement
Date: January 15, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: December 17, 2018Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 28, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: February 11, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 24, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Summons Issued on
Date: February 14, 2019Answer Filed
Date: February 05, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: February 01, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: March 08, 2019Proof of Sub-Service Filed, As to: with fees of:
Date: November 15, 2018Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: February 14, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 10, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 18, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 28, 2019Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 24, 2019Declaration re:
Date: January 15, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: February 10, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 12, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 15, 2021Supplemental Brief Filed
Date: July 21, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 18, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: September 24, 2021Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 01, 2018Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 28, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 24, 2022Answer Filed
Date: March 08, 2019Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: July 25, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: November 30, 2021Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:
Date: August 03, 2018Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 18, 2019Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: 2022-03-17T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 22, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 18, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Settlement filed by plaintiff Latoya Jenkins |
|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE; EX PARTE WAS NOT FILED. UNABLE TO PROCESS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE. |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): EXPARTE IS NOT TIMELY |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Stip and order- duplicate to that filed 1/18/24 |
|
February 20, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 15, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope #14021505- Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: Duplicate filing. Stip to continue previously filed on 01/18/24. Should you have any questions, you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm. |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed For Continuance of Trial Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.