Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Lobel Financial Corp. A California Corporation, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Lobel, Gary Dean, against Ashby-Woods, Gloria L, Woods, Oliver, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: November 26, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: November 26, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 26, 2018Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: November 26, 2018Complaint Filed
Date: July 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 30, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: July 30, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 30, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 27, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: September 05, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 22, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: November 26, 2018Rqst for Entry of Dflt and Rqst for Clerk's/Court Jmt Filed
Date: November 26, 2018Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: November 30, 2018Notice Filed
Date: January 05, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.