Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
California Business Bureau, Inc, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Love, Franklin Jay, against Gaxiola-Lopez, Maricela, Lopez, Mario, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Gilbert G. Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryApplication For Renewal Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Renewal of Judgment Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: June 29, 2018Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: June 21, 2019Notice of Opposition to Claim of Exemption Filed
Date: December 26, 2019Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 02, 2020Claim of Exemption Form Filed
Date: January 02, 2020Order Filed Re:
Date: January 23, 2020Document(s) Placed in File
Date: February 03, 2020Certificate of Electronic Recording Imaged
Date: January 23, 2020Amended Document Filed re:
Date: February 03, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Document(s) Placed in File NOTICE OF ACTION FROM RIVERSIDE SHERIFF PLACED IN FILE |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed re: AMENDED ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED. |
|
February 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Comment: AMENDED ORDER AND MINUTE ORDER SENT TO RIVERSIDE SHERIFF. |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING IMAGED | |
January 23, 2020 |
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION GILBERT OCHOA,JUDGE CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT M KILGORE - APPEARANCES: FRANKLIN J LOVE FOR CALIFORNIA BUSINESS BUREAU, INC NOT PRESENT DEFENDANT MARICELA GAXIOLA-LOPEZ PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD. MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:38 CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SUBMITTED. WITNESS -- MARICELA GAXIOLA-LOPEZ IS SWORN AND EXAMINED. AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT : - COURT FINDS: CLAIM OF EXEMPTION GRANTED. LEVYING OFFICER LOCATION: RIVERSIDE COUNTY THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE EARNINGS HELD IN THE AMOUNT OF $208.91 TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR AND THE REMAINING BALANCE OF EARNINGS HELD ($208.91) IS TO BE RELEASED TO THE JUDGMENT DEBTOR . ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. ORDER TO LEVYING OFFICER PRINTED FOR MARICELA GAXIOLA-LOPEZ NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 01/23/20 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE 08:42 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === ==MINUTE ORDER CHANGED OR CORRECTED BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT J. MEDINA; CHANGES MADE ARE AS FOLLOWS: HALF MONIES RELEASED CORRECTED TO $208.91 == ====MINUTE ORDER CORRECTED ON 02/03/20 ==== NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL AMENDED MINUTE ORDER DATED 02/03/20 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL AMENDED MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Comment: CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER & MINUTE ORDER SENT TO RIVERSIDE SHERIFF |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed CLAIM OF EXEMPTION WITH $0.00 IN HOLDING , FILED. |
|
January 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FORM FILED BY MARICELA GAXIOLA-LOPEZ |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.