Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Gibson, Lisa, represented by Mediator Law Group, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Lynn M. Poncin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time360 days |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 29, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: June 29, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 23, 2018Notice Sent re:
Date: August 23, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 21, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 24, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: September 21, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: February 22, 2019Order Filed Re:
Date: June 24, 2019Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: May 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE. | |
September 13, 2019 | |||
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes COURT TRIAL SET FOR COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF SYNCHRONY BANK |
|
July 01, 2019 | |||
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: SIGNED ORDER. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY SYNCHRONY BANK FOR STIP AND ORDER 190621-0412-CK RSO/ 20.00 PAYMT 190621-0412-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 18947 | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FILED. |
|
March 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Department Changed DEFAULT DPT. CHANGED FROM DEFAULT DEPARTMENT WAS CHANGED FROM S16J TO S16. TO . |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed TRIAL NOTICE FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.