Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Lopez, Veronica E, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Lynn M. Poncin presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryCollections-Crc3.740 |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time507 days |
Notice Imaged
Date: June 29, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 29, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 27, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 24, 2018Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: June 25, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: November 12, 2019Certificate of Electronic Recording Imaged
Date: November 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING IMAGED | |
November 18, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Judicial Officer Poncin, Lynn Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL LYNN PONCIN,JUDGE CLERK: ILAYALI WADE COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT C. BELLAMY - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF. DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 09:12 - COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. REASON: PURSUANT TO THE REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. 09:12 ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
November 18, 2019 | Hearing | Certificate of Electronic Recording Imaged View Document CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING IMAGED Comment CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING IMAGED | |
November 18, 2019 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Judicial Officer Poncin, Lynn Hearing Time 08:30 AM Result Held Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL | |
November 18, 2019 |
Judge: Poncin, Lynn |
||
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
November 12, 2019 | Hearing | Notice of Return of Document(s) View Document NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) Comment NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
November 12, 2019 | Hearing | Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Comment REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE HAS ALREADY BEEN DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. | |
November 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): CASE HAS ALREADY BEEN DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. |
|
July 01, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.