Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mandarich Law Group Llp, against Ehnes, William, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Plotkin, Barry L presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections - Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time423 days |
Declaration re:
Date: June 29, 2018Declaration re:
Date: June 29, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 29, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: June 29, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 23, 2018Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: February 11, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: August 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL BARRY L PLOTKIN,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT C SAYRE - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFF. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:57 COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THE PARTIES SETTLED IN THIS MATTER. DEFENDANT HAS MADE ALL PAYMENTS PURSUANT TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PLAINTIFF COUNSEL'S REQUEST. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE 08:57 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
August 26, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes View Document OSC RE- DISMISSAL BARRY L PLOTKIN,JUDGE CLERK- JES Judicial Officer Plotkin, Barry L Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL BARRY L PLOTKIN,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT C SAYRE - APPEARANCES: SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY CHERYL HOUDE FOR PLAINTIFF. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 08:57 COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THE PARTIES SETTLED IN THIS MATTER. DEFENDANT HAS MADE ALL PAYMENTS PURSUANT TO THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. ON PLAINTIFF COUNSEL'S MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PLAINTIFF COUNSEL'S REQUEST. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE 08:57 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === | |
August 26, 2019 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Judicial Officer Plotkin, Barry L Hearing Time 8:30 AM Result Held Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL | |
August 26, 2019 |
Judge: Plotkin, Barry L |
||
July 01, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 | |
July 01, 2019 | Hearing | OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 Original Type OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 | |
July 01, 2019 | |||
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
February 14, 2019 | Hearing | Vacate Hearing Scheduled Comment VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/01/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. | |
February 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/01/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.