Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Weiner, Julia D, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Office Of Laurel A. Buchanan, against Mark Christopher Auto Center, Mark Christopher Chevrolet Inc, represented by Shulman Hodges & Bastian Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Lynn M. Poncin presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryOther Contract $10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time339 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: June 29, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 24, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: August 31, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: December 31, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 14, 2019Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: May 14, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: May 14, 2019Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: June 03, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL | |
August 09, 2019 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL | |
August 09, 2019 | |||
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
June 10, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. | |
June 10, 2019 | Hearing | Jury Trial Original Type Jury Trial Hearing Time 10:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. | |
June 10, 2019 | |||
June 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes JURY TRIAL -- ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH HOURS. |
|
June 06, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment READINESS CALENDAR | |
June 06, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:POSSIBLE SANCTIONS ON PLTF FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.