Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Reed, Kayla, filed a(n) Intentional Torts - Torts case represented by Manning Law, Apc, against Avanti Hotel, Llc A California Limited Company, represented by Cravens, Leonard, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryCivil Rights - Discrimination |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeIntentional Torts |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: June 29, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 29, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 16, 2018Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: March 03, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: March 22, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: July 15, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 17, 2021 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Poncin, Lynn |
||
May 13, 2021 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Poncin, Lynn |
||
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Return to Court's Control | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): notice of settlement |
|
October 22, 2020 | |||
July 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Sent re: NOTICE OF MEDIATION TO BE HELD REMOTELY SENT. YOUR MEDIATION SCHEDULED FOR 10/22/20 WILL BE HELD REMOTELY. PLEASE CONTACT IFHMB. USE THE CONTACT INFORMATION ON THE ATTACHED FORM TO SCHEDULE YOUR MEDIATION TIME. |
|
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL: LETTER TO ONE LEGAL RECEIVED BACK FROM USPS. | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF S28'S MEDIATION ORDERS BY MAIL ON 07/10/20 AS TO LAW OFFICES OF LEONARD CRAVENS, FILED. |
|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed NOTICE OF RULING ON 07/01/20 OSC RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE FILED. |
|
July 01, 2020 |
Judge: Poncin, Lynn |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.