Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Vaquera, Denise, Vaquera, Jesse, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Pro Se, against Malman, Carrie, Malman, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Bryan F. Foster presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time245 days |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 29, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: June 29, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: March 01, 2019Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed
Date: March 01, 2019Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: March 01, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 26, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2019 | |||
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:DISMISSAL (STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT) |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JESSE VAQUERA FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JESSE VAQUERA ORDERED ENTERED 03/01/19 JUDGMENT FOR: JESSE VAQUERA, DENISE VAQUERA JUDGMENT AGAINST: CHRISTOPHER MALMAN JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $25,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $435.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $25435.00 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST CHRISTOPHER MALMAN FILED. |
|
March 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) OF JESSE VAQUERA AS TO CHRISTOPHER MALMAN. |
|
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
February 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): DEF WAS PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED IN COURT HRG ON 12/28/18. |
|
February 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): DFLT JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): 585 DECLARATION REQUIRED; DEFENDANT CARRIE MALMAN PREVIOUSLY DISMISSED IN COURT. |
|
February 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.