Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Azhand, Hamid Ullah, Azhand, Nawin Ishaq, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ghozland Law Firm,P.C., against Focht, Janalea Lehuanani, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael M. Dest presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2018 |
CategoryPersonal Injury Motor Vehicle $10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time273 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 29, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: June 29, 2018Legacy Minutes
Date: December 31, 2018Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: February 01, 2019Legacy Minutes
Date: April 02, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL | |
May 06, 2019 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Original Type Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment OSC RE: DISMISSAL | |
May 06, 2019 | |||
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
May 02, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/SERVICE COMPLETION | |
May 02, 2019 | Hearing | Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Original Type Order to Show Cause - Predisposition Hearing Time 8:30 AM Cancel Reason Vacated Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/SERVICE COMPLETION | |
May 02, 2019 | |||
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/SERVICE COMPLETION |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SANCTIONS/STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC MICHAEL M DEST,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 09:17 COURT STAFF INFORM THE COURT A PHONE CALL WAS RECEIVED THIS MORNING DURING CALENDAR REPRESENTING DISMISSAL WAS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT ON 03/29/19. - COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR TODAY'S HEARING. - SHOULD DISMISSAL BE FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING, NO SANCTIONS WILL BE IMPOSED AND THIS MATTER WILL GO OFF CALENDAR. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/SERVICE COMPLETION SET FOR 05/02/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF TODAY'S MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE 09:17 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
|
April 02, 2019 | Hearing | Legacy Minutes View Document ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE-SANCTIONS-STATUS OF SERVICE Judicial Officer Dest, Michael M Comment ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE:SANCTIONS/STATUS OF SERVICE/TSC MICHAEL M DEST,JUDGE CLERK: JESSICA JOANIS COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER;NONE COURT ATTENDANT A MARTINEZ - APPEARANCES: NO APPEARANCE. - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED 09:17 COURT STAFF INFORM THE COURT A PHONE CALL WAS RECEIVED THIS MORNING DURING CALENDAR REPRESENTING DISMISSAL WAS SUBMITTED TO THE COURT ON 03/29/19. - COURT SETS THIS MATTER FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY SANCTIONS IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00 SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR FOR TODAY'S HEARING. - SHOULD DISMISSAL BE FILED PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING, NO SANCTIONS WILL BE IMPOSED AND THIS MATTER WILL GO OFF CALENDAR. - HEARINGS: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : POSSIBLE SANCTIONS/SERVICE COMPLETION SET FOR 05/02/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF TODAY'S MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD. ACTION - COMPLETE 09:17 CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED. === MINUTE ORDER END === |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.