Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Wetzel, Tammie, filed a(n) Miscellaneous Complaint-Complex case represented by Keeling Law Offices Pc, against Ferreline A Wetzel, Individually And As Managing General Partner Of Pioneer, Ferreline A Wetzel Llc, Ferreline A Wetzel Pplp, Henry, Elain, Pioneer Properties, L.P., (total of 7) See All represented by Bridgford Gleason & Artinian, Cornman & Swartz, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management770 days |
|
Filing DateMay 11, 2018 |
CategoryMiscellaneous Complaint-Complex |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Motion Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Motion Filed
Date: October 30, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: October 23, 2020Motion Filed
Date: October 02, 2020Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: September 28, 2020Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 17, 2020Notice Imaged
Date: July 31, 2019Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 26, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 04, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: February 14, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 18, 2019Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 21, 2019Summons Issued on
Date: January 11, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 02, 2018Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 02, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 10, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 11, 2019Notice Sent re:
Date: December 19, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 21, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 18, 2018Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: October 02, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 27, 2018Motion Filed
Date: July 27, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 11, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 17, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 21, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 21, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 21, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 11, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 11, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: May 11, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 26, 2020Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 31, 2020Notice Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Proof of Service
Date: February 01, 2021Proof of Service
Date: February 04, 2021Tentative decisions
Date: February 08, 2021Tentative decisions
Date: February 11, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 10, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 18, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 08, 2021Proof of Service
Date: March 16, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 17, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 19, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: April 01, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 01, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 06, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: April 13, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 19, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 08, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: September 17, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-10-02T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2020-12-15T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2020-12-21T00:00:00Tentative decisions
Date: 2020-12-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: 2020-12-30T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Application for
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Application for
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Application for
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Application for
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Application for
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Notice
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-01-06T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: 2021-01-12T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 20, 2021Tentative decisions
Date: January 26, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Supplemental Brief Filed
Date: 2021-01-20T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-01-21T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-01-26T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-01-29T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Supplemental Brief Filed
Date: 2021-02-04T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Proof of Service
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-02-10T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-03-05T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Ex Parte Application
Date: 2021-03-17T00:00:00Amended Document Filed re:
Date: 2021-03-18T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Objection Filed
Date: 2021-03-22T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-04-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-04-02T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-04-08T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Motion re:
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: 2021-06-15T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2021 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
November 01, 2021 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Request for Dismissal with prejudice received on 9/10/2021. Duplicate filed on 9/17/2021. Request for Dismissal received on 9/10/2021 processed on 9/22/2021. |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed filed by pla Tammie Wetzel served parties all defendants served on 9/8/21 |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed with prejudice |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Request for dismissal returned. Form CIV-110 prohibits for class action. |
|
September 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Return to Court's Control | |
August 16, 2021 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
August 12, 2021 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
July 21, 2021 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.