Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nelson & Kennard, against Watson, Angela, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 30, 2018Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: July 23, 2018Proof of Service UNSERVED Filed
Date: May 24, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: July 23, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: July 23, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 08, 2019 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED 191008-0562-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 191008-0562-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK#604639 | |
May 03, 2019 | |||
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
November 05, 2018 | |||
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ANGELA WATSON. | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 07/23/18 JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. JUDGMENT AGAINST: ANGELA WATSON JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $5,720.23 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $384.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6104.23 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO ANGELA WATSON. |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed STATEMENT OF ACCOUNT * FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.