Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Jh Portfolio Debt Equities, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mandarich Law Group Llp, against Dehart, Jeffrey A, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 24, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 30, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 23, 2018Declaration re:
Date: December 21, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: December 28, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: December 21, 2018Declaration re:
Date: December 21, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2019 | |||
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC FILED JUDGMENT ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 12/28/18 JUDGMENT FOR: JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: JEFFREY A DEHART JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,997.99 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $291.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3288.99 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) ACTION - COMPLETE |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: ACCEPTING COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED BY JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: IN SUPPORT OF CALCULATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST AND ATTORNEYS FEES FILED BY JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC. | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST JEFFREY A DEHART FILED. |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Default Entered as to DEFAULT ENTERED ON REDUCED COLLECTIONS OF JH PORTFOLIO DEBT EQUITIES, LLC AS TO JEFFREY A DEHART. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.