Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Thacker, Jason, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 30, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 23, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: September 04, 2018Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: September 04, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: September 04, 2018Notice Filed Re:
Date: April 19, 2019Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: April 19, 2019Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Filed
Date: November 15, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE RETURNED FROM LA COUNTY SAT ISFIED WITH 0 COSTS FILED. |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles WRIT RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY; SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF NTC OF LEVY, WRIT OF EXECUTION BY MAIL ON 06/20/19 AS TO DEFENDANT, FILED. |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED. | |
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Filed - Status is now: JUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED. |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( IN THE AMOUNT OF $4174.15 ) |
|
May 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Paid WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID 190516-0304-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 190516-0304-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 118653 |
|
April 30, 2019 | |||
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
April 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME AND FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK(USA) N.A.. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.