Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Burwell, David, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections$10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
This complaint is a judgment entered against the defendant, David Burwell, by default. The defendant was properly served with a copy of the summons and complaint but failed to answer or appear in court within the allowed time. The default was entered...
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 30, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: August 01, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 01, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2018Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: August 01, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: August 01, 2018Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: January 31, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 22, 2020Notice Filed Re:
Date: May 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM ADDRESS FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY WITHIN-FIRM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Orange WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO ORANGE COUNTY. ( 12965.67 ) |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ Fee Paid WRIT FEE OF $40.00 PAID 200522-0442-CK MJX/ 40.00 PAYMT 200522-0442-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 143401 |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $333.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Orange WRIT RETURNED UNSATISFIED FROM ORANGE COUNTY WITH COSTS OF $0.00. |
|
April 30, 2019 | |||
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 30, 2018 | |||
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.