Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Hinnaoui, Yesenia, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 30, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: August 23, 2018Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: September 04, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2019 | |||
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 30, 2018 | |||
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
September 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/30/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled For: HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17 - RESCHEDULED TO: |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARING RE: 4/30/19 IS RE-ASSIGNED. | |
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing Scheduled For: HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/30/18 AT 8:30 IN DEPARTMENT S16J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.