Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Debt Resolve, Llc A Limited Liability Company, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Office Of Kenosian & Miele, Llp, against Behzad, Hooman, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 07, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2018Declaration re: Reduced Filing Fees BP6322.1(c)(1) Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: July 05, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Declaration re:
Date: July 05, 2018Order Filed Re:
Date: July 17, 2018Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: September 18, 2018Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: May 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - Los Angeles LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $75.00. |
|
May 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $168.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $528.86) |
|
May 03, 2019 | |||
May 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
November 05, 2018 | |||
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $39.37) |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Los Angeles WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. ( 3330.23 ) 180918-0428-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180918-0428-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 247881 |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. | |
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY DEBT RESOLVE, LLC FOR ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT 180816-0167-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180816-0167-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK 245797 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.