Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by The Moore Law Group, against Carrillo, Juan C, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 19, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: July 31, 2018Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 21, 2018Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: July 31, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 31, 2018Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: November 19, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 40.00/ CHECK/ 05062020/ ABS |
|
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Abstract of Judgment Issued | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - Riverside WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY. ( 6157.10 ) |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) |
|
November 19, 2019 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR WRIT 191126-0738-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 191126-0738-CK REFERENCE NUMBER CK#1008991 | |
April 30, 2019 | |||
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY MAIL ON 11/19/18 AS TO JUAN C CARRILLO, FILED. |
|
November 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Re: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. |
|
October 30, 2018 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.