Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Vo, Quan, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 30, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: April 30, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 30, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 30, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: August 13, 2018Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: August 13, 2018Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: August 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2019 | |||
April 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 30, 2018 | |||
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT FEE 180914-0799-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180914-0799-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 098093 | |
September 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Does Only DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. AS TO DOES ONLY |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST QUAN VO FILED. |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. ORDERED ENTERED 08/13/18 JUDGMENT FOR: CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. JUDGMENT AGAINST: QUAN VO JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,987.08 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $310.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5297.08 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.