Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Ayala, Eli Salvador, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Garcia Reed & Ramirez Llp, against All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal Or Equitable Right Title Lien Or Interest I, Dickerson, James L, represented by Reid & Hellyer, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Michael A. Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 24, 2018 |
CategoryReal Property |
Last RefreshedOctober 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Cycle Time251 days |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 24, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: April 24, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 24, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 24, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 06, 2018Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer
Date: September 26, 2018At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: October 09, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2019 | |||
March 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE |
|
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED. | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: ORDER TO DISMISS ACTION FOR FAILURE TO AMEND FOLLOWING THE SUSTAINING OF DEMURRER FILED |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes EX PARTE HEARING RE: APPLICATION TO DISMISS. MICHAEL A SACHS,JUDGE CLERK: KIMBERLY HOTCHKISS COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS;9826 COURT ATTENDANT GARY TREADWAY - APPEARANCES: ATTORNEY KIKI MANTI ENGEL PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT JAMES L. DICKERSON. EZ, LLP GARCIA REED & RAMIR FOR ELI SALVADOR AYALA NOT PRESENT - PROCEEDINGS: PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD. DEFENSE COUNSEL ADVISES THE COURT THEY HAVE ATTEMPTED CONTACTING PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AND HAVE HAD NO RESPONSE. EX PARTE ORDERS GRANTED. ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE. MOVING PARTY TO PREPARE NOTICE OF RULING. - HEARINGS: VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/05/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S28. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT TO GIVE NOTICE. ACTION - COMPLETE === MINUTE ORDER END === COURT ORDERS ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. REASON: PLAINTIFF FAILED TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Filed EX PARTE APPLICATION TO DISMISS FILED. |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY JAMES L DICKERSON FOR EXPARTE FEE 181228-0225-CK MMF/ 60.00 CRU/ 30.00 PAYMT 181228-0225-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 63168 | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF DANIEL E KATZ FILED |
|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed DECLARATION OF BERNICE SMITH FILED |
|
November 06, 2018 |
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.