Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Veros Credit, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Law Offices Of Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Hill, Antoinette N, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice Imaged
Date: April 12, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 12, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: April 12, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 12, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 12, 2018Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 01, 2018Request for Dismissal Filed
Date: June 11, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 31, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2019 | |||
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
October 18, 2018 | |||
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
August 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE. STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) | |
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Vacate Hearing Scheduled VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/18/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17. |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ANTOINETTE N HILL; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 04/25/18 WITH COSTS OF $67.50 FILED. |
|
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE IMAGED | |
April 12, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.