Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc As Assignee Of Synchrony Bank Fka Ge Capita, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn Law Group, Apc, against Portillo, Lucy, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 04, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Judgment on Complaint Filed
Date: August 20, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: April 04, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 04, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 04, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: August 16, 2018Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of
Date: December 31, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 08, 2019Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino
Date: April 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Returned - San Bernardino LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $35.00. |
|
April 04, 2019 | |||
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Memo of Costs Filed. Costs and Interest in the Amount of MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $62.00) |
|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of Execution Issued - San Bernardino WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY. ( 3554.19 ) 181231-0250-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 181231-0250-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 832933 |
|
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FOR ABSTRACT 181102-0536-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 181102-0536-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 0829994 | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
October 03, 2018 | |||
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment on Complaint Filed JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC FILED JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 08/20/18 JUDGMENT FOR: CAVALRY SPV I, LLC JUDGMENT AGAINST: LUCY PORTILLO JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,157.69 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $309.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00. JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $3467.19 STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV) |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event | DECLARATION & ORDER RE: USE OF COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS FILED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.