Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude & Felix Apc, against Quintana, Gabriela E, represented by Law Offices Of Robert S. Gitmeid & Assoc., Pllc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2018 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice of Return of Document(s)
Date: August 08, 2018Request for Entry of Default and Request for Clerk's/Court
Date: July 10, 2018Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: July 08, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 22, 2018Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 22, 2018Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: July 10, 2018Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: July 10, 2018Notice Imaged
Date: March 22, 2018Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed ORDER OF DISCHARGE CHAPTER 7 FILED. |
|
March 27, 2019 | |||
March 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740 |
|
September 28, 2018 | |||
September 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Legacy Minutes OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740 |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED | |
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event | FILING FEE PAID BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR ABSTRACT FEE 180824-0743-CK MJF/ 25.00 PAYMT 180824-0743-CK REFERENCE NUMBER 095511 | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S) | |
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): ANSWER IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): JUDGMENT WAS ENTERED ON 07/10/18. |
|
August 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Attorney Added for Defendant ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) OF CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A. FOR GABRIELA E QUINTANA, ATTORNEY LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT S. GITMEID & ASSOC., PLLC ADDED. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.